Assembly | 08/22/2014 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24). | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2014 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 3693.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3403.) (May 6). | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |