California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1412 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill June 23, 2014
Bill June 9, 2014
Bill May 7, 2014