Assembly | 08/14/2014 | Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2014 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2014 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3648.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3716.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3257.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2014 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |