|
09/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4881.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6422.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6231.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5998.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was reported from committee on June 25, 2014.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3532.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3296.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|