|
09/27/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 696, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 6026.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to L. Gov.) suspended. (Page 5488.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3322.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3037.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|