California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB142 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2013

Amended

Bill August 22, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013