|
09/19/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 490, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4606.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6128.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6026.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3612.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3716.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3296.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|