|
08/22/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 259, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4404.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5917.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3493.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3297.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|