|
09/19/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 491, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4947.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6540.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6340.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3533.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3312.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3281.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29 in PUB. S. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|