Assembly | 06/18/2014 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2014 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 3702.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 19. Page 3666.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3666.) | ||
Senate | 05/13/2014 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3403.) (May 6). | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 3121.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |