Senate | 05/29/2013 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 9. Page 719.) | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |