California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1440 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014
Bill April 1, 2014