|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 930, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4951.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6539.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6020.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3438.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3387.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3234.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|