|
09/30/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4972.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6126.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3493.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3234.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22 in E. & C.A. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|