|
09/18/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 12. Page 6020.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 3656.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3717.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3308.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Set for hearing April 24. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3036.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|