|
07/10/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/10/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5706.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3467.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3308.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|