LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1460
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1460
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1460
Compare Versions
SB1460 Chaptered September 29, 2014
SB1460 Enrolled August 29, 2014
SB1460 Amended August 22, 2014
SB1460 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1460 Introduced February 25, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1460 Chaptered September 29, 2014
SB1460 Enrolled August 29, 2014
SB1460 Amended August 22, 2014
SB1460 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1460 Introduced February 25, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare