|
06/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 54, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5548.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3418.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3312.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|