|
07/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5815.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3418.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3258.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2014
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|