LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1466
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1466
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1466
Compare Versions
SB1466 Chaptered September 9, 2014
SB1466 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB1466 Amended August 18, 2014
SB1466 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1466 Amended July 1, 2014
SB1466 Amended June 2, 2014
SB1466 Introduced March 25, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1466 Chaptered September 9, 2014
SB1466 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB1466 Amended August 18, 2014
SB1466 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1466 Amended July 1, 2014
SB1466 Amended June 2, 2014
SB1466 Introduced March 25, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare