Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 01/14/2014 | Set, final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 6. Page 2590.) | ||
Senate | 01/08/2014 | Set for hearing January 14. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |