Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |