California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB152 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 27, 2013

Amended

Bill August 8, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013
Bill March 19, 2013