|
02/27/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2013
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2035.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 2716.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2607.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2201.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 710.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 662.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|