|
02/27/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor. In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2871.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1184.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1007.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 485.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Read first time. From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|