07/03/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2013. | |||
07/03/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/26/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2129.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 332.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 290.) (March 13). | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Set for hearing March 13. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2013 | Read first time. From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected February 6.) |