Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2686.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2644.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2014
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 937.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|