Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1203.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1191.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 591.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Read first time. From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|