Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2014 | Set for hearing January 23. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 390.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2013 | Read first time. From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |