|
08/27/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 173, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1854.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 2510.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 576.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 391.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|