|
08/16/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 16. Page 2290.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 942.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 881.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|