|
09/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6224.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2663.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2644.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2014
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2597.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2014
|
Set for hearing January 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|