LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB176
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB176
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB176
Compare Versions
SB176 Amended August 7, 2013
SB176 Amended June 18, 2013
SB176 Amended May 28, 2013
SB176 Amended April 24, 2013
SB176 Introduced February 6, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB176 Amended August 7, 2013
SB176 Amended June 18, 2013
SB176 Amended May 28, 2013
SB176 Amended April 24, 2013
SB176 Introduced February 6, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare