LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB177
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB177
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB177
Compare Versions
SB177 Chaptered October 2, 2013
SB177 Enrolled September 11, 2013
SB177 Amended August 5, 2013
SB177 Amended June 19, 2013
SB177 Amended May 24, 2013
SB177 Amended April 11, 2013
SB177 Introduced February 6, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB177 Chaptered October 2, 2013
SB177 Enrolled September 11, 2013
SB177 Amended August 5, 2013
SB177 Amended June 19, 2013
SB177 Amended May 24, 2013
SB177 Amended April 11, 2013
SB177 Introduced February 6, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare