Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |