LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB184
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB184
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB184
Compare Versions
SB184 Chaptered September 6, 2013
SB184 Enrolled August 23, 2013
SB184 Amended August 8, 2013
SB184 Amended June 10, 2013
SB184 Amended April 9, 2013
SB184 Introduced February 6, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB184 Chaptered September 6, 2013
SB184 Enrolled August 23, 2013
SB184 Amended August 8, 2013
SB184 Amended June 10, 2013
SB184 Amended April 9, 2013
SB184 Introduced February 6, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare