California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB185 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 27, 2013

Amended

Bill June 25, 2013
Bill May 15, 2013
Bill May 2, 2013