Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 390.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |