Senate | 06/18/2013 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 1008.) | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 791.) (May 1). | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Set for hearing May 1. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |