Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 639.) (April 23). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |