LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB195
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB195
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB195
Compare Versions
SB195 Chaptered September 26, 2013
SB195 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB195 Amended September 6, 2013
SB195 Amended August 20, 2013
SB195 Amended May 24, 2013
SB195 Amended April 24, 2013
SB195 Introduced February 7, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB195 Chaptered September 26, 2013
SB195 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB195 Amended September 6, 2013
SB195 Amended August 20, 2013
SB195 Amended May 24, 2013
SB195 Amended April 24, 2013
SB195 Introduced February 7, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare