|
09/28/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4884.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4881.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2014
|
Set for hearing August 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4748.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6295.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on B.,P. & C.P.) suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 2502.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 1112.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 936.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 638.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Read first time. From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|