|
02/27/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2013
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 2368.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 3148.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 2939.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 944.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 936.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 638.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Read first time. From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|