LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB207
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB207
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB207
Action History
Senate
02/03/2014
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
04/15/2013
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Senate
03/28/2013
Set for hearing April 15.
Senate
02/21/2013
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Senate
02/11/2013
Read first time. From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
Senate
02/08/2013
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.