Assembly
|
08/29/2014
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6338.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 2684.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2644.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2014
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2591.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2013
|
Set for hearing January 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|