|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 278, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Amendments by Assembly Member Wagner tabled on motion by Assembly Member Atkins. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 2697.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 2698.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1186.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1008.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 567.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 325.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Set for hearing March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. (Introduced measure version corrected February 13.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|