Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |