Assembly | 08/30/2013 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2013 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2013 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1187.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2013 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1009.) (May 23). | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 421.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |