Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2013 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 665.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |