Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |